Date of birth/Age: | Jul 11, 1954 (69) |
---|---|
Place of Birth: | San Severino Marche |
Citizenship: | Italy |
Avg. term as coach: |
1.22 Years |
Coaching Licence: | UEFA Pro Licence |
Preferred formation: | 3-5-2 flat |
Fabrizio Castori
IMAGO
- Date of birth/Age: Jul 11, 1954 (69)
- Place of birth: San Severino Marche
- Citizenship: Italy
- Coaching Licence : UEFA Pro Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 1.22 Years
- Preferred formation : 3-5-2 flat
Personal Details
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ascoli Manager | 23/24 (Nov 13, 2023) | 23/24 (Mar 12, 2024) | 16 | 1.00 | ||
Perugia Manager | 22/23 (Oct 19, 2022) | 22/23 (Jun 30, 2023) | 29 | 1.21 | ||
Perugia Manager | 22/23 (Jun 8, 2022) | 22/23 (Sep 19, 2022) | 7 | 0.57 | ||
Salernitana Manager | 20/21 (Aug 10, 2020) | 21/22 (Oct 17, 2021) | 49 | 1.61 | ||
Trapani Manager | 19/20 (Dec 19, 2019) | 19/20 (Aug 9, 2020) | 22 | 1.50 | ||
Carpi Manager | 18/19 (Sep 18, 2018) | 18/19 (Jun 30, 2019) | 33 | 0.88 | ||
Cesena Manager | 17/18 (Oct 1, 2017) | 18/19 (Jul 24, 2018) | 35 | 1.31 | ||
Carpi Manager | 15/16 (Nov 3, 2015) | 16/17 (Jun 30, 2017) | 79 | 1.41 | ||
Carpi Manager | 14/15 (Jul 1, 2014) | 15/16 (Sep 28, 2015) | 50 | 1.70 | ||
Reggina Manager | 13/14 (Oct 21, 2013) | 13/14 (Dec 3, 2013) | 5 | 0.80 | ||
Varese Manager | 12/13 (Jun 13, 2012) | 12/13 (Apr 17, 2013) | 39 | 1.44 | ||
Ascoli Manager | 10/11 (Nov 3, 2010) | 11/12 (Nov 2, 2011) | 45 | 1.29 | ||
Piacenza Manager | 09/10 (Jul 3, 2009) | 09/10 (Nov 11, 2009) | 14 | 0.64 | ||
Salernitana Manager | 08/09 (Jan 24, 2009) | 08/09 (Apr 5, 2009) | 12 | 1.17 | ||
Salernitana Manager | 08/09 (Jul 1, 2008) | 08/09 (Dec 6, 2008) | 21 | 1.33 | ||
Cesena Manager | 07/08 (Feb 25, 2008) | 07/08 (Jun 6, 2008) | 15 | 0.80 | ||
Cesena Manager | 03/04 (Jul 1, 2003) | 07/08 (Nov 12, 2007) | 187 | 1.32 | ||
Lanciano Manager | 00/01 (Jul 1, 2000) | 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | 107 | 1.59 | ||
Castel di Sangr Manager | 99/00 (Jul 1, 1999) | 99/00 (Dec 31, 1999) | 16 | 0.94 | ||
Lanciano Manager | 98/99 (Jul 1, 1998) | 98/99 (Jun 30, 1999) | - | 0.00 | ||
Tolentino Manager | 92/93 (Jul 1, 1992) | 97/98 (Jun 30, 1998) | 104 | 1.06 |
Former clubs
Grottese (1987-1988), Cerreto (1988-1991), Monturanese (1991-1992)